LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB848
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB848
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB848
Compare Versions
SB848 Chaptered June 27, 2016
SB848 Enrolled June 15, 2016
SB848 Amended June 12, 2016
SB848 Amended May 25, 2016
SB848 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB848 Chaptered June 27, 2016
SB848 Enrolled June 15, 2016
SB848 Amended June 12, 2016
SB848 Amended May 25, 2016
SB848 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare