California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB851 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/23/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 851AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 23, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review JANUARY 7, 2016  An act relating to the Budget Act of 2016.   An act to amend the Budget Act of 2016 by amending Items 2240-101-6   082, 2240-105-0001, and 4260-001-3085 of Section 2.00 of, and Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 851, as amended, Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review. Budget Act of 2016.  The Budget Act of 2016 made appropriations for the support of state government for the 2016-17 fiscal year.   This bill would amend the Budget Act of 2016 by revising items of appropriation and making other changes.   This bill would declare that it is to take effect immediately as a Budget Bill.   This bill would express the intent of the Legislature to enact statutory changes relating to the Budget Act of 2016.  Vote: majority. Appropriation:  no   yes  . Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Item 2240-101-6082 of Section 2.00 of the   Budget Act of 2016   is amended to read:  2240-101-6082--For local assistance, Department of Housing and Community Development, payable from the Housing for Veterans Fund................................. 75,000,000 Schedule: (1) 1665-Financial Assistance Program..... 75,000,000 Provisions: 1. The Director of Finance may authorize an increase in this appropriation, up to the total amount of proceeds available pursuant to the Veterans Housing and Homeless Prevention Bond Act of 2014. Any approved increase shall correspond to the level of awards anticipated by the Department of Housing and Community Development. An approval of an augmentation may be authorized not sooner than 30 days after notification is provided in writing to the Chairperson of the Joint Legislative Budget Committee and the chairpersons of the committees in each house of the Legislature that consider appropriations. 2. Notwithstanding Section 16304.1 of the Government Code, funds appropriated in this item shall be available for liquidation of encumbrances until June 30, 2022. The Director of Finance may authorize an extension of the liquidation period if it is determined that an extension is needed to facilitate a project's completion. An approval may be authorized not sooner than 30 days after notification is provided in writing to the Chairperson of the Joint Legislative Budget Committee and the chairpersons of the committees in each house of the Legislature that consider appropriations.  3. Of the funds appropriated in this   item, $10,000,000 shall be made   available by the Department of   Housing and Community Development,   in consultation with the Department   of Veterans Affairs, for loans to   counties or private nonprofit   organizations, or both, for the   construction or rehabilitation of   transitional housing or shelter   facilitates that provide services   for homeless veterans. The   Department of Housing and Community   Development shall include in the   guidelines priority for applicants   that demonstrate need and focus on   long-term solutions, including   funding for mental health and   addiction treatment services, as  well as having proven long-term   effectiveness.   SEC. 2.   Item 2240-105-0001 of Section 2.00 of the   Budget Act of 2016   is amended to read:  2240-105-0001--For transfer by the Controller to the Emergency Housing and 45,000,00 Assistance Fund.............................. 0 Provisions: 1. The funds transferred by this item shall be used for support costs and local assistance associated with administering the California Emergency Solutions Grant Program as set forth in Chapter 19 (commencing with Section 50899.1) of Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code.  2. Of the funds appropriated in   this item, $10,000,000 shall be   made available to the Office of   Emergency Services for the   Homeless Youth Emergency   Service Pilot Projects as set   forth in Chapter 6 (commencing   with Section 13700) of Part 3   of Division 9 of the Welfare   and Institutions Code to fund   new pilot projects over five   years for the County of Orange,   the County of Fresno, the   County of San Bernardino, and   the County of El Dorado.   SEC. 3.   Item 4260-001-3085 of Section 2.00 of the   Budget Act of 2016   is amended to read:  4260-001-3085--For support of Department of Health Care Services, payable from the Mental Health Services Fund..........................  13,120,000   13,620,000  Schedule: (1) 3960-Health Care Services...............  13,120,000   13,620,000  Provisions: 1. Funds appropriated in this item are in lieu of the amounts that otherwise would have been appropriated for administration pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 5892 of the Welfare and Institutions Code. 2. Of the funds appropriated in this item, $4,000,000 is available for encumbrance or expenditure until June 30, 2019, to support suicide hotlines throughout the state only if the Department of Finance determines that funds are available from the amounts allocated for state administration of the Mental Health Services Fund pursuant to subdivision (d) of Section 5892 of the Welfare and Institutions Code. These funds shall not be released sooner than 30 days after the Department of Finance provides notification of the availability of funds in writing to the chairpersons of the committees in each house of the Legislature that consider appropriations, the chairpersons of the committees in each house of the Legislature that consider the State Budget, and the Chairperson of the Joint Legislative Budget Committee.  SEC. 4.   Section 39.00 of the   Budget Act of 2016   is amended to read:  SEC. 39.00. The Legislature hereby finds and declares that the following bills are other bills providing for appropriations related to the Budget Bill within the meaning of subdivision (e) of Section 12 of Article IV of the California Constitution: AB 1600, AB 1601, AB 1602, AB 1603, AB 1604, AB 1605, AB 1606, AB 1607, AB 1608, AB 1609, AB 1610, AB 1611, AB 1612, AB 1613, AB 1614, AB 1615, AB 1616, AB 1617, AB 1618, AB 1619, AB 1620, AB 1621, AB 1622, AB 1623, SB 828, SB 829, SB 830, SB 831, SB 832, SB 833, SB 834, SB 835, SB 836, SB 837, SB 838, SB 839, SB 840, SB 841, SB 842, SB 843, SB 844, SB 845, SB 846, SB 847, SB 848, SB 849, SB 850,  SB 851,  and SB 852.  SEC. 5.   This act is a Budget Bill within the meaning of subdivision (e) of Section 12 of Article IV of the California Constitution and shall take effect immediately.   SECTION 1.   It is the intent of the Legislature to enact statutory changes, relating to the Budget Act of 2016.