California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 31, 2016
Bill August 30, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 8, 2016
Bill May 25, 2016