LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB867
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB867
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB867
Action History
Senate
04/12/2016
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Senate
04/11/2016
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5).
Senate
03/15/2016
Set for hearing April 5.
Senate
01/28/2016
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Senate
01/12/2016
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
Senate
01/11/2016
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.