Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 21 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 4084.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3612.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3396.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|