Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | June 21 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2016 | June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4036.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3998.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3394.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |