Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | April 12 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | April 5 hearing: Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3396.) | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. (Reconsideration vote only). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2016 | March 29 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 7. Page 3336.) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |