Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. | ||
Senate | 01/15/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |