Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6478.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 5945.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5968.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 4037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3612.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|