|
08/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 167, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5717.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 4127.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3998.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3521.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|