Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2016 | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 4076.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (May 3). | ||
Senate | 04/21/2016 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |