Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Set for hearing May 4. (Vote only). | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | April 27 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 2. Page 3698.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |