|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4643.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5574.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5473.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 3902.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3888.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Motion to place on APPR. suspense file failed. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3888.) (May 16)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
May 2 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3612.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
April 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|