Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2016 | June 28 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | June 21 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3964.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3519.) (April 12). | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |