|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 5451.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6238.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4084.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3312.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|