Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | April 5 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2016 | March 29 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2016 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |