Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4095.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3999.) (May 27). | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3200.) (March 9). | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Set for hearing March 9. | ||
Senate | 01/27/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |