California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB916 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016