|
08/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5718.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3664.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
March 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2016
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|