Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3738.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3700.) (April 26). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2016 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |