Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3192.) (March 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2016 | Set for hearing March 8. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |