|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6022.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3842.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3741.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3396.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|