Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3239.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Set for hearing March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/04/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | ||
Senate | 02/03/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |