California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB953 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016