|
08/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 231, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4863.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 5711.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11.) Ordered to the Assembly. Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hertzberg. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3628.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 3628.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3420.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|