|
08/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 212, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3517.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|