|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5514.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5919.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 4087.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4000.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3332.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
March 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|