Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2016 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | May 16 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2016 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2016 | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3645.) (April 20). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2016 | April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2016 | Set for hearing April 13. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |