Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2016 | June 28 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2016 | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2016 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4145.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2016 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2016 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 16. Page 3665.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mitchell. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3665.) | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3395.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |