Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3392.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |