|
05/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4793.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3432.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3334.) (March 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
March 16 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2016
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|