California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016