Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4000.) (May 27). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2016 | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2016 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 19). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |