LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB978
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB978
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB978
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
03/16/2016
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
Senate
03/14/2016
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/18/2016
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Senate
02/11/2016
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
Senate
02/10/2016
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.