Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | June 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 4. Page 4490.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2016 | Set for hearing June 22. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2016 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/11/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |