Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
June 20 set for first hearing. Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. June 20 hearing: Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 5.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4001.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2016
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3420.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
March 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|