Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2016
|
Set for hearing August 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4604.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
Set for hearing June 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3645.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20 in HEALTH pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3491.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|