|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5501.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Set for hearing August 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5387.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5880.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4087.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4001.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3558.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|