|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 499, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 5447.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 8. Page 6228.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5950.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 3929.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3888.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3559.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13 in HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2016
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|