Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2015 | September 8 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2015 | Set for hearing September 8. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2015 | September 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2015 | Set for hearing September 1. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | August 19 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2015 | Set for hearing August 19. | ||
Senate | 07/17/2015 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on T. & I.D. To print. |