LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX113
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SBX113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX113
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
09/03/2015
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Senate
08/19/2015
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 37.) (August 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Senate
08/06/2015
Set for hearing August 19.
Senate
07/17/2015
From printer.
Senate
07/16/2015
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on T. & I.D. To print.