LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX12
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SBX12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX12
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
09/01/2015
September 1 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 9. Page 56.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
08/28/2015
Set for hearing September 1.
Senate
07/01/2015
From printer.
Senate
06/30/2015
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on T. & I.D. To print.