LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX13
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SBX13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX13
Action History
Senate
09/14/2015
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Senate
08/19/2015
August 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 9. Page 36.)
Senate
08/17/2015
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & I.D.
Senate
08/06/2015
Set for hearing August 19.
Senate
07/02/2015
From printer.
Senate
07/01/2015
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on T. & I.D. To print.