Assembly | 03/15/2016 | From Assembly without further action. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2015 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 51.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/25/2015 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 37.) (August 24). | ||
Senate | 08/21/2015 | Set for hearing August 24. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 29.) (August 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2015 | Set for hearing August 19. | ||
Senate | 07/17/2015 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. To print. |