California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SBX25 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 16, 2015

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill May 4, 2016

Amended

Bill March 2, 2016
Bill February 29, 2016
Bill August 26, 2015