Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | May 3 set for first hearing.Testimony taken. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2016 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Coms. on ED., JUD., and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |