Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on the inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 5405.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4378.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4265.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Motion to place on APPR. suspense file failed. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 4265.) (June 13)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2016
|
Set for hearing June 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4235.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Set for hearing June 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|