Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2015 | July 15 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 6. Page 1950.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2015 | Set for hearing July 15. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |