LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCA5
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SCA5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCA5
Action History
Senate
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Senate
04/12/2016
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Senate
04/07/2015
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR.
Senate
03/27/2015
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 26.
Senate
03/26/2015
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.