Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2016 | Set for hearing January 19 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2016 | January 12 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2016 | Set for hearing January 12. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | May 5 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Set for hearing May 5. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2015 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 10. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |